+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government with 1 substitute
- State Government first Substitute Offered
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 956
- Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 955
- Barfoot Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Tourism as Favorable
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 13, 2021: Roll 955
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
April 13, 2021: Roll 956
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor