+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-91.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 464
- Third Reading Passed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 506
- Third Reading Passed
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2015: Roll 464
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 74
April 16, 2015: Roll 506
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor