+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-516)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-516.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1213
- Third Reading Passed
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 609
- Third Reading Passed
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2021: Roll 1213
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
March 16, 2021: Roll 609
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor