+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-507)
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-507.
- Signature Requested
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1224
- Third Reading Passed
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor at 4:48 p.m. on May 30, 2019
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Roberts Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Engrossed
- Roberts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1183
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1184
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Smitherman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2019: Roll 1224
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2019: Roll 1183
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2019: Roll 1184
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor