+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-4)
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Dismukes intended to vote "Yea"
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-4.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 71
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Forwarded to Governor on February 11, 2021
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 34
- Figures motion to Reconsider adopted Roll Call 45
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 46
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2021: Roll 71
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 14
February 4, 2021: Roll 34
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 6
February 4, 2021: Roll 45
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
February 4, 2021: Roll 46
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor