+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from State Government
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1167
- Third Reading Passed
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Acted on by Judiciary as Favorable
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
April 27, 2021: Roll 1167
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor