+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-167)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-167.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Williams (P) motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 545
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 544
- Third Reading Passed
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Madison County Legislation
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Holtzclaw motion to Adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 472
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 471
- Third Reading Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Madison County
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2018: Roll 544
- Yeas: 64
- Present/NV: 38
March 1, 2018: Roll 545
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 68
February 22, 2018: Roll 471
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
February 22, 2018: Roll 472
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor