+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 858
- Third Reading Passed
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On September 8, 0018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-216)
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: Roll 858
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor