+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
- Delivered to Governor
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 852
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- County and Municipal Government 1st Amendment Offered
- Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 530
- Elliott 1st Amendment Offered
- Elliott motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 531
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 532
- Engrossed
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- County and Municipal Government 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 852 Vote
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
April 16, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 16, 2024: Waggoner motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 530 Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 16, 2024: Elliott motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 531 Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 16, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 532 Vote
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
J.T. 'Jabo' Waggoner
Type:
Primary Sponsor