+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Further Consideration
- McMillan motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- McMillan motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 27
- Livingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 26
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
August 5, 2015: Roll 26
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
August 5, 2015: Roll 27
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor