+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee on SB287 2013RS first Substitute Offered
- Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
- Assigned Act No. 2013-289.
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Concurred in Conference Report
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1225
- Conference Report Concurrence Requested
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 1021
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1020
- Smitherman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee lost Roll Call 1019
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1018
- Conference Report
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Orr motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 715 P&PO appoints Orr, Williams, Phil and Beasley
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Requested
- Clouse motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1058 House appoints Clouse, Barton and Newton (C)
- Hubbard (J) inadvertently voted "Nay" and intended to vote "Yea"
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 713
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 712
- Ford Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 711
- Barton first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 210
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 209
- Third Reading Passed
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (11)
May 20, 2013: Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1225
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 35
May 9, 2013: Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1018
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 7
May 9, 2013: Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1020
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 6
May 9, 2013: Smitherman table Smitherman motion to reconsider adopted Roll Call 1021
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 4
May 9, 2013: Smitherman motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee lost Roll Call 1019
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 24
May 2, 2013: Clouse motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1058 House appoints Clouse, Barton and Newton (C)
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 1
May 2, 2013: Orr motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 715 P&PO appoints Orr, Williams, Phil and Beasley
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
April 23, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 713
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 16
April 23, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 712
- Yeas: 99
April 23, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 711
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 33
March 7, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor