+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (65)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee on SB286 2013RS first Substitute Offered
- Assigned Act No. 2013-283.
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Concurred in Conference Report
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Henry motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1221
- Conference Report Concurrence Requested
- Delivered to Governor at 2:17 p.m. on May 20, 2013
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Requested
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 919
- Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 920 P&PO appoints Beason, Bedford and Sanford
- Conference Report
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Henry motion to Accede adopted Voice Vote House appoints Henry, Williams (J) and Colston
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1006
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1007
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Scott Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1060
- Henry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1061
- England Amendment Offered
- Henry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1062
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1063
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sanford motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 312
- Beason motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 315
- Beason Amendment Offered
- Brewbaker motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 314
- Brewbaker Amendment Offered
- Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 313
- Williams Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 310
- Sanford Amendment Offered
- Williams motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 311
- Williams Amendment Offered
- Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 316
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Beason motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 309
- Beason first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Williams Amendment Offered
- Figures motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 323
- Taylor Amendment Offered
- Singleton Amendment Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 326
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 325
- Figures motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 324
- Figures Amendment Offered
- Figures Amendment Offered
- Singleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 322
- Coleman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 321
- Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 317
- Coleman Amendment Offered
- Coleman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 320
- Coleman Amendment Offered
- Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 319
- Taylor Amendment Offered
- Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 318
- Taylor Amendment Offered
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (20)
+ − Votes (25)
May 20, 2013: Henry motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1221
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 28
May 9, 2013: Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1007
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
May 9, 2013: Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 920 P&PO appoints Beason, Bedford and Sanford
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
May 9, 2013: Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1006
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
May 2, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1060
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 21
May 2, 2013: Henry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1062
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 33
May 2, 2013: Henry motion to Table adopted Roll Call 1061
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 28
May 2, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1063
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 27
April 4, 2013: Williams motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 311
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 20
April 4, 2013: Beason motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 315
- Yeas: 28
April 4, 2013: Brewbaker motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 314
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 6
April 4, 2013: Coleman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 320
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 22
April 4, 2013: Coleman motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 321
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 21
April 4, 2013: Figures motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 323
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 21
April 4, 2013: Figures motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 324
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 21
April 4, 2013: Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 310
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
April 4, 2013: Beason motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 309
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
April 4, 2013: Sanford motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 312
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 23
April 4, 2013: Singleton motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 322
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 14
April 4, 2013: Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 317
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 1
April 4, 2013: Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 318
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
April 4, 2013: Taylor motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 319
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
April 4, 2013: Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 313
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 9
April 4, 2013: Williams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 316
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
March 5, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor