+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-207)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-207.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 658
- Third Reading Passed
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 394
- Third Reading Passed
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2019: Roll 658
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 93
April 25, 2019: Roll 394
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor