+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-315.
- Enrolled
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1074
- Third Reading Passed
- Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered
- Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1075
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1076
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1222
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 474
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 473
- Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 26, 2015: Roll 1074
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 12
May 26, 2015: Roll 1075
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 12
May 26, 2015: Roll 1076
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 16
May 26, 2015: Roll 1222
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
April 14, 2015: Roll 473
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Roll 474
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor