+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-526)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-526.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1032
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 779
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Shelnutt motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2018: Roll 1032
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
March 13, 2018: Roll 779
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor