+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Gudger motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1116 P&PO appoints Gudger, Scofield and Smitherman
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1008
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Faulkner Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1007
- Jones (M) Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1009
- Lee Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1010
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1011
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 494
- Third Reading Passed
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (7)
April 7, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1007 Vote
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 12
April 7, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1008 Vote
- Yeas: 82
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 19
April 7, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1009 Vote
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 37
April 7, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1010 Vote
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 12
- Absent: 41
April 7, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1011 Vote
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 27
April 7, 2022: Gudger motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1116 P&PO appoints Gudger, Scofield and Smitherman Vote
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
March 9, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 494 Vote
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor