+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-477)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-477.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1203
- Third Reading Passed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 578
- Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 577
- Singleton first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2019: Roll 1203
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
May 2, 2019: Roll 577
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
May 2, 2019: Roll 578
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor