+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-500.
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 36
- Third Reading Passed
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 22
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
August 7, 2015: Roll 36
- Yeas: 64
- Present/NV: 40
August 5, 2015: Roll 22
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor