+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2014-303.
- Signature Requested
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1034
- Third Reading Passed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 241
- Beasley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 240
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1034
- Yeas: 97
January 30, 2014: Beasley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 240
- Yeas: 22
January 28, 2014: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor