+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (4)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Indefinitely Postponed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee on Tourism and Marketing
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2017: Roll 379
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2017: Roll 380
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
April 4, 2017: Roll 381
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor