+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
- Economic Development and Tourism first Amendment Offered
- Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism with 1 amendment
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 381
- Jones motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 380
- Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2019: Roll 380
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 23, 2019: Roll 381
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor