+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Delivered to Governor
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Mobile County Legislation Engrossed Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 976
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 977
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Mobile County Legislation 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Mobile County Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Mobile County Legislation 1st Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 646
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 647
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Mobile County Legislation 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Mobile County Legislation
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 30, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 48
April 30, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 976 Vote
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 79
April 30, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 977 Vote
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 82
April 18, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 18, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 646 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 18, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 647 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor