+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-548)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-548.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1052
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 753
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 752
- Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2018: Roll 1052
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
March 8, 2018: Roll 752
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
March 8, 2018: Roll 753
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor