+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1035
- Third Reading Passed
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 456
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2017: Roll 1035
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 5
April 6, 2017: Roll 456
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor