+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-365)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
- Assigned Act No. 2018-365.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 849
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 585
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 584
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Smitherman Amendment Offered
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 586
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 587
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 588
- Engrossed
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Smitherman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (6)
March 15, 2018: Roll 849
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 5
March 1, 2018: Roll 584
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
March 1, 2018: Roll 585
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
March 1, 2018: Roll 586
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
March 1, 2018: Roll 587
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
March 1, 2018: Roll 588
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor