+ − Effective Date
- April 13, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-390.
- Enrolled
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 889
- Third Reading Passed
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 573
- Third Reading Passed
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Vote
April 5, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 889 Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor