+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-481)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-481.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1379
- Concurrence Requested
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1229
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1228
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 154
- Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 153
- Chambliss motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 152
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (6)
May 30, 2019: Roll 1228
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
May 30, 2019: Roll 1229
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 4
May 30, 2019: Roll 1379
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
April 4, 2019: Roll 152
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 4, 2019: Roll 153
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 4, 2019: Roll 154
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor