+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-494)
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee on SB257 2018RS first Substitute Offered
- Assigned Act No. 2018-494.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Concurred in Conference Report
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- McCampbell motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1084
- Conference Report Concurrence Requested
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development first Amendment Offered
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sanders motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1087
- Conference Report
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sanders motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 927 P&PO appoints Sanders, Williams, Phil and Reed
- Concurrence Requested
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Requested
- McCampbell motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 943 House appoints McCampbell, Nordgren and Garrett
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 924
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 923
- Knight Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 922
- Fiscal Responsibility first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Fiscal Responsibility
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 383
- Sanders motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 382
- Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 28, 2018: Roll 1084
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 6
March 22, 2018: Roll 1087
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
March 21, 2018: Roll 943
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 9
March 21, 2018: Roll 927
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
March 20, 2018: Roll 922
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 5
March 20, 2018: Roll 923
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 11
March 20, 2018: Roll 924
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 5
February 13, 2018: Roll 382
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 7
February 13, 2018: Roll 383
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor