+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Education Policy first Amendment Offered
- Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Education Policy with 1 amendment
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 316
- Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
+ − Vote
April 18, 2019: Roll 316
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor