+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rereferred from C&SB to W&ME
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Scofield motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Transportation and Energy first Substitute Offered
- Scofield motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Scofield first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Holtzclaw Amendment Offered
- Scofield motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
- Scofield motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Scofield Substitute Further Consideration
- Hightower Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Hightower motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 552
- Scofield Substitute Further Consideration
- Scofield motion to Adopt Substitute as Amended adopted Roll Call 553
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 554
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 11, 2017: Roll 552
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 11, 2017: Roll 553
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 11, 2017: Roll 554
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor