+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-267)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-267.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 703
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601
- Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 600
- Albritton Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2018: Roll 703
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 79
March 6, 2018: Roll 600
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
March 6, 2018: Roll 601
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor