+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2019-225)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-225.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 682
- Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 331
- Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 330
- Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 329
- Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered
- Transportation and Energy Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
+ − Votes (4)
May 14, 2019: Roll 682
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2019: Roll 329
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2019: Roll 330
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
April 18, 2019: Roll 331
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor