+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2020-177)
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor at 12:47 p.m. on May 8, 2020
- Assigned Act No. 2020-177.
On May 8, 2020 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 8, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 564
- Third Reading Passed
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On May 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation
On May 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 433
- Third Reading Passed
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2020: Roll 564
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 57
May 5, 2020: Roll 433
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor