+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 151
- Third Reading Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 197
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 5, 2016: Roll 517
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2016: Roll 518
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2016: Roll 519
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2016: Roll 520
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2016: Roll 151
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 87
February 24, 2016: Roll 197
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor