+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 905
- Third Reading Passed
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 800
- Third Reading Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: Roll 905
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 21
April 26, 2016: Roll 800
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor