+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 7:02 p.m. on May 20, 2013
- Assigned Act No. 2013-286.
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1041
- Concurrence Requested
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1125
- Agriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1126
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 392
- Third Reading Passed
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2013: Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1041
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
May 7, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1125
- Yeas: 98
May 7, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1126
- Yeas: 99