+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Forwarded to Governor on May 4, 2017 at 11:35 a.m.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Coleman intended to vote "Nay"
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 760
- Third Reading Passed
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 716
- Third Reading Passed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2017: Roll 760
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 85
April 27, 2017: Roll 716
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor