+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 341
- Third Reading Passed
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bussman motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 6, 2017: Roll 484
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 16, 2017: Roll 341
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor