+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- McMillan motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 774 House appoints McMillan, Davis and Knight
- Conference Committee Requested
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Marsh motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 876 P&PO appoints Pittman, Dial and Ross
- Concurrence Requested
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 747
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 746
- McMillan Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 745
- Education Policy Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 520
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 519
- Smitherman Amendment Offered
- Ross motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 518
- Ross Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 517
- Education and Youth Affairs first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (9)
April 28, 2016: Roll 774
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 10
April 28, 2016: Roll 876
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
April 27, 2016: Roll 745
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 9
April 27, 2016: Roll 746
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 13
April 27, 2016: Roll 747
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 11
April 5, 2016: Roll 519
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2016: Roll 518
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2016: Roll 520
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2016: Roll 517
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor