+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
- Enrolled
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 847
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Carried Over to the Call of the Chair
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Judiciary 1st Amendment Offered
- Barfoot motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote
- Barfoot 1st Amendment Offered
- Barfoot motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 386
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 387
On April 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Judiciary 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 25, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 847 Vote
- Yeas: 103
April 9, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2024: Barfoot motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 386 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 387 Vote
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor