+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-534.
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Greer motion to Table adopted Roll Call 49
- Third Reading Passed
- Greer motion to withdraw his motion adopted Voice Vote
- Greer motion to Table adopted Roll Call
- Signature Requested
- Greer motion to Carry Over Temporarily pending
- Greer motion to withdraw his motion adopted Voice Vote
- Knight Amendment Offered
- Greer motion to Table adopted Roll Call
- Boyd motion to Carry Over Temporarily pending
- Greer motion to withdraw his motion to table offered
- Boyd motion to Miscellaneous adopted Voice Vote
- Boyd motion to Carry Over Until Specified Time lost Roll Call 50
- Knight motion to Carry Over 12 hours lost Roll Call 51
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 52
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Greer motion to Table offered
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Pittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Engrossed
- Pittman Amendment Offered
- Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 34
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 35
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
On August 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2015: Roll 49
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 17
August 11, 2015: Roll 50
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 54
- Present/NV: 30
August 11, 2015: Roll 51
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 59
- Present/NV: 16
August 11, 2015: Roll 52
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 34
August 5, 2015: Roll 34
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
August 5, 2015: Roll 35
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor