+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2020-49)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2020-49.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 340
- Third Reading Passed
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 150
- Third Reading Passed
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2020: Roll 340
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
February 20, 2020: Roll 150
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor