+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Third Reading in Second House
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Further Consideration
- Hurst motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Allen motion to Withdraw his Amendment adopted Voice Vote
- Allen Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1159
- Lovvorn Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1158
- Hurst Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 518
- Third Reading Passed
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 6, 2021: Roll 1158
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
May 6, 2021: Roll 1159
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
March 11, 2021: Roll 518
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor