+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Boards, Agencies and Commissions
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 786
- Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 785
- Bussman Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 784
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 783
- Health and Human Services first Substitute Offered
- Health and Human Services Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 5, 2015: Roll 783
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 5, 2015: Roll 784
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 5, 2015: Roll 785
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 5, 2015: Roll 786
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor