+ − Effective Date
- July 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-375.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote 907
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 908
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 943
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 552
- Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 551
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 5, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote 907 Vote
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 5, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Voice Vote 908 Vote
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 5, 2022: Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 943 Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 10, 2022: Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 551 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
March 10, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 552 Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor