+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
- Delivered to Governor
- Enrolled
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Health Engrossed Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 837
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 838
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Carried Over to the Call of the Chair
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On February 20, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- AC&F Substitute Offered
- Williams motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 47
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 48
On February 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 837 Vote
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
April 25, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 838 Vote
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 15, 2024: Williams motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 47 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 15, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 48 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor