+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-404)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-404.
- Delivered to Governor at 12:00 p.m. on March 22, 2018
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 997
- Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 203
- Third Reading Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2018: Roll 997
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 34
January 30, 2018: Roll 203
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor