+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2021-341)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Butler motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1214
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Ledbetter Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1054
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1055
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-341.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Banking and Insurance first Substitute Offered
- Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 864
- Butler Amendment Offered
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 865
- Butler Amendment Offered
- Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 866
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 867
- Engrossed
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
April 29, 2021: Roll 1054
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 17
April 29, 2021: Roll 1055
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 2
April 29, 2021: Roll 1214
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 5
April 8, 2021: Roll 864
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
April 8, 2021: Roll 865
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
April 8, 2021: Roll 866
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 3
April 8, 2021: Roll 867
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor