+ − Effective Date
- January 01, 2023
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-301.
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Boyd 2nd Amendment Offered
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Boyd 1st Amendment Offered
- Garrett motion to Table adopted Roll Call 931
- Garrett Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 932
- Garrett motion to Table adopted Roll Call 933
- Kitchens motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 934
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 935
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurrence Requested
- Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1033
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Orr Amendment Offered
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 691
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 692
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
April 6, 2022: Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1033 Vote
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
April 6, 2022: Garrett motion to Table adopted Roll Call 931 Vote
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 10
April 6, 2022: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 932 Vote
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 12
April 6, 2022: Garrett motion to Table adopted Roll Call 933 Vote
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 1
April 6, 2022: Kitchens motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 934 Vote
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 5
April 6, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 935 Vote
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor