+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signature Requested
- Delivered to Governor at 1:20 p.m. on April 23, 2013
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2013-118.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 557
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 249
- Pittman Amendment Offered
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 250
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 251
- Engrossed
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Job Creation and Economic Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 557
- Yeas: 101
March 20, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 250
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
March 20, 2013: Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 249
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor